EP0029974 - Sulphone amides, their preparation and their use as antimicrobial substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1981/23] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien -Patentabteilung- Postfach 1100 Henkelstrasse 67 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Syldatk, Andreas, Dr. Kolhagenstrasse 44 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Stracke, Heinz-Ulrich, Dr. Oskar-Erbslöh-Strasse 38a D-4018 Langenfeld / DE | [1981/23] | Application number, filing date | 80107277.8 | 21.11.1980 | [1981/23] | Priority number, date | DE19792948185 | 30.11.1979 Original published format: DE 2948185 | [1981/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029974 | Date: | 10.06.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C143/72, C07C143/822, A01N41/06 | [1981/23] | CPC: |
A01N41/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/23] | Title | German: | Neue Sulfonamide, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung als antimikrobielle Substanzen | [1981/23] | English: | Sulphone amides, their preparation and their use as antimicrobial substances | [1981/23] | French: | Sulfonamides, leur préparation et leur utilisation comme substances antimicrobiennes | [1981/23] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 02.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.08.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR875M [ ]; | DE2415330 [ ]; | FR1605475 [ ]; | DE2530243 [ ]; | DE1251895 [ ] |