EP0030010 - Bulk material box and unitary storing and shipping container comprising such a box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/23] | Bulk material box | ||
[1984/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.1985 [1985/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/23] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Fu-Tong 39 Clair Drive Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 02 /
Kantz, John Francis Box 248D Oxford, New Jersey 07863 / US | [1981/23] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/23] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80107405.5 | 27.11.1980 | [1981/23] | Priority number, date | US19790098066 | 28.11.1979 Original published format: US 98066 | [1981/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030010 | Date: | 10.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030010 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/20 | [1981/23] | CPC: |
B65D19/20 (EP,US);
B65D7/00 (KR);
B65D5/12 (EP,US);
B65D5/2033 (EP,US);
B65D77/0466 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00019 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00029 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00034 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00044 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00064 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00069 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00099 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00104 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00159 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00194 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00293 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00323 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00333 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00353 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00497 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/23] | Title | German: | Behälter für Schüttgut sowie Lager- und Versandeinheit mit solchem Behälter | [1984/02] | English: | Bulk material box and unitary storing and shipping container comprising such a box | [1984/02] | French: | Réceptacle pour matériau en vrac et ensemble pour le stockage et le transport comprenant un tel réceptacle | [1984/02] |
Former [1981/23] | Behälter für Schüttgut | ||
Former [1981/23] | Bulk material box | ||
Former [1981/23] | Réceptacle pour matériau en vrac | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 30.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3036752 [ ] (ELLIOTT CHARLES I); | US4013168 [ ] (BAMBURG ROBERT A, et al) |