EP0031478 - Colour-fast monoazo dyestuff, its preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.1984 [1984/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1981/27] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 80 03 20 D-65926 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schickfluss, Rudolf, Dr. Luisenstrasse 37 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 02 /
Kruse, Hubert Luisenstrasse 33 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [1981/27] | Application number, filing date | 80107549.0 | 03.12.1980 | [1981/27] | Priority number, date | DE19792950588 | 15.12.1979 Original published format: DE 2950588 | [1981/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0031478 | Date: | 08.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031478 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/48, C09B67/10, C09B29/08, D06P3/54 | [1981/27] | CPC: |
C09B29/0813 (EP);
C09B67/0015 (EP);
C09B67/0029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/27] | Title | German: | Färbestabiler Monoazofarbstoff, dessen Herstellung und Verwendung | [1981/27] | English: | Colour-fast monoazo dyestuff, its preparation and use | [1981/27] | French: | Modification stable d'un colorant monoazoique, sa préparation et son utilisation | [1981/27] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 08.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3122410 [ ] (CURT MUELLER, et al) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 90, Nr. 16 April 1979, Seite 74, Zusammenfassung Nr. 123029g Columbus, Ohio, US G.V. SHALIMOVA et al.: "Effect of crystal structure on the coloristic properties of vat and disperse dyes II. Effect of morphological characteristics of disperse dyes-1,1'-azobenzene derivatives on their physicochemical and coloristic properties" & Zh. Prikl. Khim. (Leningrad) 1978, 51(12), 2745-9 * Zusammenfassung * | Examination | LU56463 | FR2322175 | DE1069313 | DE1260654 | US2007382 |