EP0030374 - Adhesive products and manufacturing methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1985 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1985 [1985/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DATAK CORPORATION 65 71st Street Guttenberg New Jersey 07093 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | For all designated states THE DATAK CORPORATION 65 71st Street Guttenberg New Jersey 07093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pointon, David W. 533 East Queens Way Sparks Nevada 89431 / US | [1981/24] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair, Schumann, Jakob, Bezold Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80107643.1 | 04.12.1980 | [1981/24] | Priority number, date | US19790101782 | 10.12.1979 Original published format: US 101782 | [1981/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030374 | Date: | 17.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030374 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02, B44C1/16, H01B7/36 | [1981/24] | CPC: |
B44C1/1733 (EP,US);
C09J7/20 (EP,US);
H01B7/368 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1981/24] | Title | German: | Klebeprodukte und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1981/24] | English: | Adhesive products and manufacturing methods | [1981/24] | French: | Produits adhésifs et procédés de fabrication | [1981/24] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/06] | 18.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2567067 [ ] (GRUPP ALFRED F, et al) |