EP0034656 - Platform scales and method of producing such platform scales [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1984 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1984 [1984/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hottinger Baldwin Messtechnik GmbH Postfach 10 01 51 64201 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | For all designated states HOTTINGER BALDWIN MESSTECHNIK GMBH Postfach 10 01 51 D-64201 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lockery, Harry E. 115 Moore Road Sudbury Massachusetts 01776 / US | [1981/35] | Representative(s) | Brand, Fritz, et al Hottinger Baldwin Messtechnik GmbH Patentabteilung Im Tiefen See 45 Postfach 42 35 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | Brand, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hottinger Baldwin Messtechnik GmbH Patentabteilung Im Tiefen See 45 Postfach 42 35 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 80107686.0 | 06.12.1980 | [1981/35] | Priority number, date | US19790105157 | 19.12.1979 Original published format: US 105157 | [1981/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034656 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034656 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01G3/14, G01L1/22 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
G01G3/1404 (EP,US);
G01G21/22 (EP,US);
G01G23/005 (EP,US);
G01L1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1983/01] |
Former [1981/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Plattformwaage und Verfahren zur Herstellung solcher Plattformwaagen | [1981/35] | English: | Platform scales and method of producing such platform scales | [1981/35] | French: | Plateforme de pesage et procédé pour la fabrication de telles plates-formes de pesage | [1981/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, IT, LU | 30.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/37] | 08.09.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.01.1981 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1981 | 06.01.1981 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1981 | 06.01.1981 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1981 | 06.01.1981 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1981 | 06.01.1981 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1981 | 06.01.1981 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   12.02.1981 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2740668 [ ] (NAT CONTROLS) | Examination | US3004231 | US3135112 | FR2331775 | US4125168 | US3439761 | DE2617987 |