EP0030389 - Aqueous ink composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.1984 [1984/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAKURA COLOR PRODUCTS CORPORATION 10/17, 1-chome, Nakamichi Higashinari-ku Osaka-shi / JP | [1981/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwahashi, Masaru 7/3, Tennojiminami 3-chome Abeno-ku Osaka-shi / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Shigeyasu 580, Unate-cho Dashihara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Murata, Yoshinori 63, Koaza-Nishitsuji Oaza-Sugai Seika-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto-fu / JP | [1981/24] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Günter, et al Rennerle 10 Postfach 3160 D-8990 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | Riebling, Günter Dr.-Ing., Dipl.-Ing., Ing.grad., et al Rennerle 10 Postfach 3160 D-8990 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 80107748.8 | 09.12.1980 | [1981/24] | Priority number, date | JP19790161094 | 11.12.1979 Original published format: JP 16109479 | [1981/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030389 | Date: | 17.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030389 | Date: | 10.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/16 | [1981/24] | CPC: |
C09D11/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/24] | Title | German: | Wässrige Tintenzusammensetzung | [1981/24] | English: | Aqueous ink composition | [1981/24] | French: | Composition aqueuse d'encre | [1981/24] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/41] | 27.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3875105 [ ] (DAUGHERTY PHILLIP M, et al) |