EP0031081 - Apparatus for stranding wires [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED 1600 Dorchester Boulevard West Montreal Quebec H3H 1R1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1981/26] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED 1600 Dorchester Boulevard West Montreal Quebec H3H 1R1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuber, Bretislav Pavel 4845 Madison Avenue Montreal Quebec H3X 3S9 / CA | [1981/26] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/27] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [1981/26] | Austin, Reginald John Langton House Market Street Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 8BE / GB | Application number, filing date | 80107780.1 | 10.12.1980 | [1981/26] | Priority number, date | CA19790342240 | 19.12.1979 Original published format: CA 342240 | [1981/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0031081 | Date: | 01.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031081 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/02, D07B5/00 | [1981/26] | CPC: |
H01B13/0235 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/26] | Title | German: | Apparat zum Verseilen von Drähten | [1981/26] | English: | Apparatus for stranding wires | [1981/26] | French: | Dispositif pour toronner des fils | [1981/26] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/44] | 26.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 24.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1180452 [ ]; | US3910022 [ ]; | GB1424662 [ ]; | CH468517 [ ]; | DE2140697 [ ] |