EP0031524 - Gas discharge display device with control grid support in the post-acceleration space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1985 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/27] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobale, Manfred, Dr.phil., Dipl.-Phys. Lärchenstrasse 11 D-8011 Faistenhaar / DE | 02 /
Littwin, Burkhard, Dipl.-Phys. J.B.Straubstrasse 2 D-8021 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | 03 /
Lorenz, Hans Peter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys. Hubertusstrasse 13 D-8501 Schwarzenbruck / DE | [1981/27] | Application number, filing date | 80107829.6 | 11.12.1980 | [1981/27] | Priority number, date | DE19792952601 | 28.12.1979 Original published format: DE 2952601 | [1981/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0031524 | Date: | 08.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031524 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/49 | [1981/27] | CPC: |
H01J17/498 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/27] | Title | German: | Gasentladungsanzeigevorrichtung mit nachbeschleunigungsraumseitiger Abstützung der Steuerscheibe | [1981/27] | English: | Gas discharge display device with control grid support in the post-acceleration space | [1981/27] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à décharge à gaz comportant dans l'espace de post-accélération un support pour la grille de commande | [1981/27] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 19.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.12.1983 | LI | 31.12.1983 | [1985/15] | Documents cited: | Search | GB1389191 [ ] (SPERRY RAND CORP); | DE2855108 [ ] (SIEMENS AG) |