EP0030728 - Feline leukemia vaccine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.1984 [1984/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 1314 Kinnear Road Columbus Ohio 43212 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | For all designated states THE OHIO STATE UNIVERSITY RESEARCH FOUNDATION 1314 Kinnear Road Columbus, Ohio 43212 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olsen, Richard G. 222 State Road Route 2 London Ohio 43160 / US | [1981/25] | Representative(s) | Tasset, Gérard Smithkline Biologicals s.a. Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | Tasset, Gérard Smithkline Biologicals s.a. Rue de l'Institut 89 B-1330 Rixensart / BE | Application number, filing date | 80107889.0 | 13.12.1980 | [1981/25] | Priority number, date | US19790104789 | 18.12.1979 Original published format: US 104789 | [1981/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0030728 | Date: | 24.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0030728 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030728 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12 | [1981/25] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/13022 (EP,US);
Y10S424/819 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1981/25] | Title | German: | Impfstoff gegen Katzenleukämie | [1981/25] | English: | Feline leukemia vaccine | [1981/25] | French: | Vaccin contre la leucémie féline | [1981/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/25] | 17.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2951509 [ ] (RESEARCH CORP); | GB2038338 [ ] (RESEARCH CORP); | FR2445338 [ ] (RESEARCH CORP [US]) |