EP0031137 - Device for determining the side margins of record sheets in typewriters or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1986 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thurz, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Guardinistrasse 40 D-8000 München 70 / DE | [1981/26] | Application number, filing date | 80107990.6 | 17.12.1980 | [1981/26] | Priority number, date | DE19792951934 | 21.12.1979 Original published format: DE 2951934 | [1981/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0031137 | Date: | 01.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0031137 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031137 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/42 | [1981/26] | CPC: |
B41J29/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für Schreibmaschinen o. dgl. zum Bestimmen der seitlichen Ränder des Aufzeichnungsträgers | [1981/26] | English: | Device for determining the side margins of record sheets in typewriters or the like | [1981/26] | French: | Dispositif pour déterminer les marges latérales des feuilles d'enregistrement dans les machines à écrire ou analogues | [1981/26] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/30] | 03.05.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3769628 (KENNY P); | [A]FR2280576 (BUNKER RAMO [US]); | [AD]FR2409155 (WORDPLEX LTD A E S [GB]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 20, Nr. 10, März 1978, Seiten 3996-3997; |