EP0031143 - Memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/26] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawate, Keiichi 12-103, Kamome-danchi 3999 Hino-machi Konan-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | [1981/26] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/26] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80107999.7 | 17.12.1980 | [1981/26] | Priority number, date | JP19790164803 | 20.12.1979 Original published format: JP 16480379 | JP19800055036 | 25.04.1980 Original published format: JP 5503680 | JP19800055037 | 25.04.1980 Original published format: JP 5503780 | JP19800055041 | 25.04.1980 Original published format: JP 5504180 | [1981/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0031143 | Date: | 01.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0031143 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031143 | Date: | 11.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [1981/26] | CPC: |
G06F11/2007 (EP,US);
G02F1/13624 (EP,US);
G11C29/70 (EP,US);
H10B12/00 (EP,US);
G02F1/136263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/26] | Title | German: | Speichervorrichtung | [1981/26] | English: | Memory device | [1981/26] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire | [1981/26] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/26] | 18.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3707767 (QUEVRIN J); | [A]US3715735 (MOSS W); | [A]DE2208158 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]DE2538373 (SIEMENS AG) |