EP0033389 - Apparatus for stretching and/or normalizing the stretching ratio of thermoplastic synthetic foils [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.05.1985 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramisch Kleinewefers GmbH Neuer Weg 24-40 D-47803 Krefeld / DE | [1981/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friz, Werner, Ing. grad. Buschdonk 1 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1981/32] | Representative(s) | Stark, Walter Moerser Strasse 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | Stark, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Moerser Strasse 140 D-47803 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 80108122.5 | 22.12.1980 | [1981/32] | Priority number, date | DE19803003381 | 31.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3003381 | [1981/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033389 | Date: | 12.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033389 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B29D7/24, B29D7/22 | [1981/32] | CPC: |
B29C55/08 (EP);
B29C55/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Recken und/oder Normalisieren des Reckverhältnisses von thermoplastischen Kunststoffolien | [1981/32] | English: | Apparatus for stretching and/or normalizing the stretching ratio of thermoplastic synthetic foils | [1981/32] | French: | Dispositif pour étirer et/ou pour normaliser la proportion d'étirage de feuilles de matière thermoplastique | [1981/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/16] | 23.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.04.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1984
01.08.1984
ADMISSIBLE SOLVAY & Cie, S.A. 33, Rue du Prince Albert Ixelles B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Bouchoms, Maurice Solvay Département de la Propriété Industrielle, 310, rue de Ransbeek B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1984
01.08.1984
ADMISSIBLE SOLVAY & Cie, S.A. 33, Rue du Prince Albert Ixelles B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Bouchoms, Maurice Solvay Département de la Propriété Industrielle, 310, rue de Ransbeek B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | 06.09.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.10.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.02.1985 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.02.1985 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1985/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.11.1983 | NL | 02.11.1983 | AT | 22.12.1983 | SE | 23.12.1983 | LU | 31.12.1983 | [1999/52] |
Former [1986/23] | BE | 02.11.1983 | |
NL | 02.11.1983 | ||
AT | 22.12.1983 | ||
SE | 23.12.1983 | ||
Former [1986/12] | BE | 02.11.1983 | |
NL | 02.11.1983 | ||
SE | 23.12.1983 | ||
Former [1985/23] | BE | 02.11.1983 | |
NL | 02.11.1983 | ||
Former [1984/22] | BE | 02.11.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1460639 [ ] (DORNIER GMBH LINDAUER) | Examination | US3076232 | DE1221000 | DE1504059 | DE1504647 | US3503843 | DE1957708 | DE1704728 | AT326601B |