EP0031166 - Process for producing heat insulation bodies and apparatus for carrying out the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1985 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 05.06.1985 [1985/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grünzweig + Hartmann und Glasfaser AG Bürgermeister-Grünzweig-Strasse 1-47 D-67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1981/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kummermehr, Hans Prinzregentenstrasse 25a D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1981/26] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/26] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 80108149.8 | 22.12.1980 | [1981/26] | Priority number, date | DE19792951577 | 21.12.1979 Original published format: DE 2951577 | [1981/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0031166 | Date: | 01.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031166 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C04B43/02, B01F5/02 | [1981/26] | CPC: |
C04B30/02 (EP);
B01F33/409 (EP);
C03C25/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B30/02, C04B40/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Wärmeisolierkörpern sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1981/26] | English: | Process for producing heat insulation bodies and apparatus for carrying out the process | [1981/26] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de corps calorifuges et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé | [1981/26] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/06] | 11.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.06.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 07.03.1984 | SE | 07.03.1984 | [1985/23] |
Former [1984/33] | SE | 07.03.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2241113 [ ] (POLYSIUS AG); | FR2333622 [ ] (KANEBO LTD [JP]); | DE2705535 [ ] (SUPRATON ZUCKER); | DE1671186 [ ] |