EP0015024 - Detergent compositions containing binary builder system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.1982 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/18] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rodriguez, Victor Frank 523 Oak Street, Apt 206 Cincinnati, OH 45211 / US | [1980/18] | Representative(s) | Ernst, Hubert, et al PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/18] | Ernst, Hubert, et al PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 80200102.4 | 07.02.1980 | [1980/18] | Priority number, date | US19790012688 | 16.02.1979 Original published format: US 12688 | [1980/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015024 | Date: | 03.09.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/08, C11D3/37 | [1980/18] | CPC: |
C11D3/128 (EP);
C11D3/3711 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/18] | Title | German: | Binäres Komplexbildnersystem enthaltende Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzungen | [1980/18] | English: | Detergent compositions containing binary builder system | [1980/18] | French: | Compositions détergentes contenant un système d'adjuvant binaire | [1980/18] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 26.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/18] | 28.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2283220 [ ]; | US4140676 [ ]; | EP0001004 [ ] |