EP0017264 - Bicyclic lactams and a process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1980/21] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scholes, Gary Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Baardman, Frank Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1980/21] | Representative(s) | Hunter, Keith Roger Ian, et al Shell International Petroleum Company Limited, Intellectual Property Division, P.O. Box 662 London SE1 7NE / GB | [1983/41] |
Former [1983/05] | Rogers, Roy Charles 4 York Road London SE1 7NA / GB | ||
Former [1980/21] | Keuzenkamp, Abraham c/o SHELL Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 80200133.9 | 15.02.1980 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | GB19790006412 | 23.02.1979 Original published format: GB 7906412 | [1980/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0017264 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0017264 | Date: | 02.02.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D221/04, // C07D209/52 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
C07D221/04 (EP,US);
C07D209/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/21] | Title | German: | Bicyclische Lactame und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1980/21] | English: | Bicyclic lactams and a process for their preparation | [1980/21] | French: | Lactames bicycliques et procédé pour leur préparation | [1980/21] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/20] | 13.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.11.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, 9th Collective Index, Chemical Substance, 1978, page 2468CS Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. & CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 78, No. 17, 30th April 1973, page 504, No. 111524d Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. A. ZABZA: "Structure and conformation of some terpene oximes and lactams" & PR. NAUK. INST. CHEM. ORG. FIZ. POLITECH. WROCLAW. 1971 No. 3, 1-89 * Abstract * |