EP0018691 - Roof covering strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.12.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1987 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.01.1988 [1988/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schusterinsel Opladen Textilveredlungsgesellschaft mbH. Brückenstrasse 10 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | [1980/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Even, Gert, Dipl.-Vw. Höhenstrasse 45 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | 02 /
Kern, Josef Friedensberger Strasse 17 D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | 03 /
de Ruiter, Ernest, Dr. Höhenstrasse 57a D-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE | [1980/23] | Representative(s) | Eggert, Hans-Gunther Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/23] | Eggert, Hans-Gunther, Dr. Räderscheidtstrasse 1 D-50935 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 80200394.7 | 26.04.1980 | [1980/23] | Priority number, date | DE19792918165 | 05.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2918165 | [1980/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0018691 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0018691 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018691 | Date: | 12.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0018691 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | D06N5/00, E04D5/02, E04D5/10 | [1980/23] | CPC: |
D06N5/00 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2066 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2139 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2525 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2607 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2713 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1980/23] | Title | German: | Dachabdeckbahn | [1980/23] | English: | Roof covering strip | [1980/23] | French: | Feuille pour le recouvrement d'un toit | [1980/23] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/28] | 11.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | Appeal received No. T281/84 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.1983
01.12.1983
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Troisdorf Aktiengesellschaft Abt.: Patente/Lizenzen D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | [1983/50] | 02.12.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.08.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.07.1987 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.10.1987 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 03.12.1984 | Appeal received No. T0281/84 | 09.05.1986 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1986/19] | 14.05.1986 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1986/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2442156 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG) | [ ] - INDUSTRIE TEXTILE, Nr. 1049, Oktober 1975, Paris, FR, WITTKE: "L'eduction des tissus pour baches en fibres synthetiques", Seiten 707-713 |