EP0021488 - Improved impact polymers and their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.04.1986 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1986 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 28.05.1986 [1986/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitehead, Richard Owen 73 Litchfield Lane Houston, Texas 77024 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1983/29] | Puister, Antonius Tonnis, Mr. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1981/01] | Keuzenkamp, Abraham c/o SHELL Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 80200520.7 | 04.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | US19790049840 | 18.06.1979 Original published format: US 49840 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021488 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0021488 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0021488 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08F279/02, C08F287/00, C08F2/02, // (C08F279/02, 212:04),(C08F287/00, 212:04) | [1981/01] | CPC: |
C08F279/02 (EP,US);
C08F287/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F279/02, C08F212/04 (US,EP);
C08F287/00, C08F212/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/01] | Title | German: | Schlagfeste Polymere und ihre Herstellung | [1981/01] | English: | Improved impact polymers and their preparation | [1981/01] | French: | Polymères résistant au choc et leur préparation | [1981/01] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/35] | 14.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.03.1984
03.05.1984
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.03.1984
03.05.1984
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 18.05.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.06.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 13.11.1985 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.01.1986 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2022489 [ ] (SINCLAIR KOPPERS CO); | GB1532199 [ ] (GLUKHOVSKOI V); | GB1536537 [ ] (UNITED STERLING CORP LTD); | [A]AU412568 ; | [A]FR1545402 (POLYMER CORP); | [A]GB1031496 (REXALL DRUG CHEMICAL); | [A]FR2037834 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO); | [A]US3459700 (RICHARDS HARRY F) |