EP0023069 - Apparatus for preparing hot drinks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANIMO B.V. Amsterdamseweg 22 NL-3812 RS Amersfoort / NL | [1981/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheepstra, Lipke Amsterdamseweg 22 NL-3800 AP Amersfoort / NL | [1981/04] | Representative(s) | Kooy, Leendert Willem, et al OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Kooy, Leendert Willem, et al OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 NL-2501 AW The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1981/04] | Kooy, Leendert Willem OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 NL-2501 AW The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 80200704.7 | 18.07.1980 | [1981/04] | Priority number, date | NL19790005650 | 20.07.1979 Original published format: NL 7905650 | [1981/04] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023069 | Date: | 28.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023069 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/56 | [1981/04] | CPC: |
A47J31/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/04] | Title | German: | Apparat zum Herstellen warmer Getränke | [1981/04] | English: | Apparatus for preparing hot drinks | [1981/04] | French: | Appareil pour la préparation de boissons chaudes | [1981/04] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/11] | 26.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.08.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.1982 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.03.1984 | BE | 21.03.1984 | FR | 21.03.1984 | IT | 21.03.1984 | LU | 31.07.1984 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 21.03.1984 | |
BE | 21.03.1984 | ||
IT | 21.03.1984 | ||
GB | 18.07.1984 | ||
LU | 31.07.1984 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 21.03.1984 | |
BE | 21.03.1984 | ||
IT | 21.03.1984 | ||
GB | 18.07.1984 | ||
Former [1989/38] | AT | 21.03.1984 | |
BE | 21.03.1984 | ||
GB | 18.07.1984 | ||
Former [1985/25] | AT | 21.03.1984 | |
BE | 21.03.1984 | ||
Former [1985/16] | BE | 21.03.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | GB663267 [ ] (JAMES STOTT & COMPANY ENGINEER, et al); | US2630061 [ ] (NATHAN SHARAF); | CH386071 [ ] (INVENTION & RESEARCH S A [CH]); | GB1072105 [ ] (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN); | NL6804851 [ ]; | FR1567342 [ ]; | DE1778190 [ ] (HGZ AG); | US3915341 [ ] (BROWN MERLE S) |