EP0026502 - Process for treating an organic phase containing ferric chloride, molybdenum chloride and hydrochloric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLURGIE HOBOKEN-OVERPELT Société anonyme dite: 8, rue Montagne du Parc B-1000 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | For all designated states METALLURGIE HOBOKEN-OVERPELT Société anonyme dite: 8, rue Montagne du Parc B-1000 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Schepper, Achille Berkenlaan 8 B-2451 Lichtaart / BE | 02 /
Coussement, Marc Magdalena Vermeerschlaan 18 B-2540 Hove / BE | [1981/14] | Representative(s) | Saelemaekers, Juul, et al METALLURGIE HOBOKEN-OVERPELT A. Greinerstraat 14 B-2710 Hoboken / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | Saelemaekers, Juul, et al METALLURGIE HOBOKEN-OVERPELT A. Greinerstraat 14 B-2710 Hoboken / BE | Application number, filing date | 80200747.6 | 06.08.1980 | [1981/14] | Priority number, date | LU19790081600 | 13.08.1979 Original published format: LU 81600 | [1981/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026502 | Date: | 08.04.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026502 | Date: | 29.12.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C01G49/00, C01G39/00, C22B3/00 | [1981/14] | CPC: |
C01G39/003 (EP,US);
C01G49/0009 (EP,US);
C22B3/383 (EP,US);
C22B3/384 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung einer organischen Phase, die Eisenchlorid, Molybdänchlorid und Salzsäure enthält | [1981/14] | English: | Process for treating an organic phase containing ferric chloride, molybdenum chloride and hydrochloric acid | [1981/14] | French: | Procédé pour traiter une phase organique contenant du chlorure de fer, du chlorure de molybdène et du HCl | [1981/14] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/31] | 02.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1592255 [ ] (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR); | DE2232460 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | US3832165 [ ] (KANE W, et al); | DE2315849 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | GB1428278 [ ] (BAYER AG, et al); | DE2062627 [ ]; | FR2327199 [ ] (DIAZ NOGUEIRA EDUARDO [ES]); | FR2396573 [ ] (INCO LTD [CA]) | Examination | - NEUE HÜTTE, Vol. 21, No. 9, septembre 1976 pages 547 à 551 |