EP0024765 - Tape recording or reproducing apparatus with rotating magnetic head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.1986 [1986/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/10] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aarts, Petrus Johannus Jacobus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Fleck, Harald c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Kocsisek, Karl c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Schmidt, Ernst Machiel c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1981/10] | Representative(s) | van Weele, Paul Johannes Frits, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/10] | Van Weele, Paul Johannes Frits, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 80200780.7 | 19.08.1980 | [1981/10] | Priority number, date | NL19790006478 | 29.08.1979 Original published format: NL 7906478 | [1981/10] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024765 | Date: | 11.03.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024765 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/52 | [1981/10] | CPC: |
G11B5/53 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/10] | Title | German: | Bandaufzeichnungs- oder Wiedergabegerät mit rotierendem Magnetkopf | [1981/10] | English: | Tape recording or reproducing apparatus with rotating magnetic head | [1981/10] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement ou de reproduction sur bande, à tête magnétique rotative | [1981/10] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/12] | 25.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | NL7507198 [ ] (GRUNDIG EMV); | US3548394 [ ] (FELTS JOHN A); | DE1227503 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US2908541 (FOMENKO SERGEI M); | [AD]AT345577B (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [AP]GB2045510 (PHILIPS NV) |