EP0028435 - Aircraft climb-out guidance system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/19] | Method and apparatus for an aircraft climb-out guidance system | ||
[1984/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1985 [1985/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707 Seattle Washington 98124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berwick, James Wallace, Jr. 8026 South Lakeridge Drive Seattle Washington 98178 / US | 02 /
Bleeg, Robert John 5057 Island Crest Way Mercer Island Washington 98040 / US | 03 /
McFaddin, Vincent Eugene 13408 SE. 168th St. Renton Washington 98055 / US | [1981/19] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | Hoijtink, Reinoud Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 80201037.1 | 31.10.1980 | [1981/19] | Priority number, date | US19790090812 | 02.11.1979 Original published format: US 90812 | [1981/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028435 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028435 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/06 | [1981/19] | CPC: |
G05D1/0661 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/19] | Title | German: | Flugzeugaufsteigsteuerungssystem | [1984/38] | English: | Aircraft climb-out guidance system | [1984/38] | French: | Système de guidage d'avion en montée | [1984/38] |
Former [1981/19] | Verfahren und Apparat für ein Flugzeugaufsteigsteuerungssystem | ||
Former [1981/19] | Method and apparatus for an aircraft climb-out guidance system | ||
Former [1981/19] | Procédé et appareillage pour un système de guidage d'avion en montée | Examination procedure | 12.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/04] | 25.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 11.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3522729 [ ] (MILLER HARRY); | US4019702 [ ] (ANNIN GORDON D); | US4021009 [ ] (BAKER DONALD H, et al); | FR2334141 [ ] (SPERRY RAND CORP [US]); | US4044975 [ ] (BLECHEN FREDERICK C, et al) |