EP0032274 - Mould, particularly for casting sanitary appliances with an integral rim of closed or open type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1982 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH Postfach 18 09, Euskirchener Strasse 80 D-53008 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/29] | For all designated states IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH Postfach 18 09, Euskirchener Strasse 80 D-53008 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biadigo, Mario Via Ampere, 102 I-20131 Milano / IT | [1981/29] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado STUDIO SECCHI & CORRADINI Via Dante Alighieri 4 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/29] | Corradini, Corrado STUDIO SECCHI & CORRADINI 4, Via Dante Alighieri I-42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | Application number, filing date | 80201247.6 | 30.12.1980 | [1981/29] | Priority number, date | IT19800046804 | 22.01.1980 Original published format: IT 4680480 | [1981/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0032274 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0032274 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/26 | [1981/29] | CPC: |
B28B1/261 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/29] | Title | German: | Form, insbesondere zum Giessen sanitärer Vorrichtungen mit einem integralen Rand geschlossener oder offener Bauart | [1981/29] | English: | Mould, particularly for casting sanitary appliances with an integral rim of closed or open type | [1981/29] | French: | Moule, en particulier pour mouler des applications sanitaires avec un bord intégral du type fermé ou ouvert | [1981/29] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/40] | 13.07.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2015917 [ ] (IDEAL STANDARD) |