EP0013595 - Improvements in tennis racquets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.1981 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STARWIN INDUSTRIES INC. 2661 Culver Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45429 / US | [1980/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Staub, Anthony F. 2920 Cathy Lane Dayton, Ohio / US | 02 /
Staub, Norman T. 3123 Santa Rosa Drive Dayton, Ohio / US | 03 /
Erwin, John R. 6634 East Sunnyvale Road Paradise Valley, Arizona / US | [1980/15] | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/15] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300019.9 | 03.01.1980 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | US19790000929 | 04.01.1979 Original published format: US 929 | [1980/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013595 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A63B49/02 | [1980/15] | CPC: |
A63B49/00 (EP);
A63B49/02 (US);
A63B49/08 (EP);
A63B2049/0203 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0204 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0207 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0212 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/15] | Title | German: | Tennisschläger | [1980/15] | English: | Improvements in tennis racquets | [1980/15] | French: | Raquettes de tennis | [1980/15] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1981/31] | 06.05.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3999756 [ ] (HEAD HOWARD); | US1539019 [ ] (NIKONOW JOHN P); | DE7837176U [ ]; | FR2299048 [ ] (PRINCE MFG INC [US]) |