EP0013613 - Electrosurgical grounding pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Products Inc. 501 George Street New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/15] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Products Inc. 501 George Street New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lazar, Lawrence S. 30 Misty Mountain Road Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US | 02 /
Wittemann, Robert F. 27 Manor Crescent New Brunswick, New Jersey 08901 / US | [1980/15] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/15] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300060.3 | 07.01.1980 | [1980/15] | Priority number, date | US19790001503 | 08.01.1979 Original published format: US 1503 | [1980/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0013613 | Date: | 23.07.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0013613 | Date: | 01.12.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/36, A61N1/04 | [1982/48] | CPC: |
A61N1/04 (EP,US);
A61B18/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/15] | A61B17/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1980/15] | Title | German: | Elektrochirurgisches Erdungskissen | [1980/15] | English: | Electrosurgical grounding pad | [1980/15] | French: | Coussin de mise à la terre pour électrochirurgie | [1980/15] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/12] | 02.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.09.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2513568 [ ] (JOSEPH KOZINSKI); | US3601126 [ ] (ESTES JERRY R); | US3845757 [ ] (WEYER J); | US3848600 [ ] (PATRICK C, et al); | US3911906 [ ] (REINHOLD JR HERBERT E); | US3972329 [ ] (KAUFMAN JOHN G); | US4004578 [ ] (PALMIUS KJELL HUBERT); | US4008721 [ ] (BURTON CHARLES V); | GB1465636 [ ] (MEDICOR MUEVEK); | US4066078 [ ] (BERG JEFFREY); | US4114263 [ ] (SZPUR ROMAN); | US4117846 [ ] (WILLIAMS FRANK R) |