EP0014050 - Interferon production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.1982 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/16] | For all designated states BEECHAM GROUP PLC Beecham House Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robinson, Jeffery Hugh 3 Hillcrest Close Epsom, Surrey / GB | [1980/16] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1981/01] | Russell, Brian John, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | ||
Former [1980/16] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr. European Patent Attorney Beecham Pharmaceuticals Great Burgh Yew Tree Bottom Road Epsom, Surrey, KT18 5XQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300086.8 | 09.01.1980 | [1980/16] | Priority number, date | GB19790001632 | 16.01.1979 Original published format: GB 7901632 | [1980/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0014050 | Date: | 06.08.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0014050 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00 | [1980/16] | CPC: |
C07K14/555 (EP,US);
C12N1/00 (EP,US);
C12P21/00 (EP,US);
C12R2001/91 (EP,US);
Y10S435/811 (EP,US);
Y10S435/948 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/16] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Interferon | [1980/16] | English: | Interferon production | [1980/16] | French: | Production d'interféron | [1980/16] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 23.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/10] | 03.07.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.03.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1525022 [ ] (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) | [ ] - H.J. MORTON: "A survey of commercially available tissue culture media", In Vitro, Vol. 6, Nr. 2, 1970, pages 89-108 * Page 92, left-hand column, line 27 to right-hand column, line 30 * |