EP0014527 - Automatic bobbin changing on thread winding machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1985 [1985/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1980/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cockshott, Peter Newall 11, Westville Avenue Ilkley West Yorkshire, LS29 9AH / GB | 02 /
Cope, Robert James 3, Stray Walk Harrogate North Yorkshire, HG2 8HU / GB | 03 /
Beck, David Ernest 'Foxhill' Skipton Road Hampsthwaite North Yorkshire, HG3 2LZ / GB | [1980/17] | Representative(s) | Robertson, Michael Mundie, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [1983/02] |
Former [1980/17] | Thompson, Alfred Brownbridge Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents Thames House North Millbank London SW1P 4QG / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300138.7 | 15.01.1980 | [1980/17] | Priority number, date | GB19790004563 | 08.02.1979 Original published format: GB 7904563 | [1980/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0014527 | Date: | 20.08.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0014527 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0014527 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/06 | [1980/17] | CPC: |
B65H67/0405 (EP,US);
B65H67/064 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/17] | Title | German: | Automatische Spulen-Auswechselvorrichtung auf Garnwickelmaschinen | [1980/17] | English: | Automatic bobbin changing on thread winding machines | [1980/17] | French: | Changeur automatique de bobine sur bobinoirs | [1980/17] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 22.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4041686 [ ] (INABA MITUGU, et al); | DE2744287 [ ] (TEIJIN LTD); | GB1588925 [ ] (TEIJIN LTD) | Examination | US3964723 |