EP0014571 - Stair mat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Naka Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1020-178 Hassamu, Nishi-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | [1980/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naka, Hiromitsu c/o Tokyo Kenkyusho of Kabushiki Kaisha Naka Gijutsu Kenkyusho No. 39 Oaza Shinmachi Yashio-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1980/17] | Representative(s) | Smith, Martin Stanley, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/17] | Smith, Martin Stanley, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300293.0 | 31.01.1980 | [1980/17] | Priority number, date | JP19790010142 | 31.01.1979 Original published format: JP 1014279 | JP19790021762 | 23.02.1979 Original published format: JP 2176279 | JP19790090614 | 30.06.1979 Original published format: JP 9061479 | [1980/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0014571 | Date: | 20.08.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0014571 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | A47G27/02, E04F11/16 | [1980/17] | CPC: |
A47G27/06 (EP);
E04F11/163 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/17] | Title | German: | Treppenläufer | [1980/17] | English: | Stair mat | [1980/17] | French: | Tapis d'escalier | [1980/17] | File destroyed: | 30.10.1991 | Examination procedure | 03.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/12] | 15.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/24] | 28.12.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB484559 [ ]; | US4054698 [ ]; | DE2201231 [ ]; | US3484316 [ ]; | DE914428 [ ] |