EP0015100 - Method of incorporating a distributed microwave circuit element in a microwave integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/18] | Improvements in or relating to methods of applying circuit elements to a substrate | ||
[1983/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.1984 [1984/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | [1983/11] |
Former [1980/18] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
England, Eric Herbert 23 Curtis Road Shrivenham Swindon, Wiltshire / GB | [1980/18] | Representative(s) | Gunning, William John, et al Procurement Executive, Ministry of Defence Patents 1A(4), Room 2014 Empress State Building Lillie Road London SW6 1TR / GB | [1983/19] |
Former [1983/11] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1980/18] | Muir, Henry Joseph, et al Procurement Executive Ministry of Defence Patents 1A4, Room 1932, 19th Floor Empress State Building Lillie Road London SW6 1TR / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300356.5 | 06.02.1980 | [1980/18] | Priority number, date | GB19790006701 | 26.02.1979 Original published format: GB 7906701 | [1980/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0015100 | Date: | 03.09.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0015100 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01L49/02 | [1980/18] | CPC: |
H01L21/702 (EP,US);
H10N97/00 (EP,US);
H05K1/0237 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K1/092 (EP,US);
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0317 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09236 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0156 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1980/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einbetten von verteilten Mikrowellen- Schaltungselementen in eine integrierte Mikrowellenschaltung | [1983/33] | English: | Method of incorporating a distributed microwave circuit element in a microwave integrated circuit | [1983/33] | French: | Procédé d'incorporation d'un élément de circuit distribué à micro-ondes dans un circuit intégré à micro-ondes | [1983/33] |
Former [1980/18] | Verfahren zum Anbringen von Schaltungselementen auf ein Substrat | ||
Former [1980/18] | Improvements in or relating to methods of applying circuit elements to a substrate | ||
Former [1980/18] | Procédé d'application d'éléments de circuit sur un substrat | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 22.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2065090 [ ] (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | US3655496 [ ] (ETTRE KITTY S, et al); | GB1315510 [ ] (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | US3762040 [ ] (BURNS J, et al); | US3785895 [ ] (ETTRE K, et al) |