EP0018064 - Method and apparatus for calcining delayed petroleum coke [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/22] | Method and apparatus for calcining particulate carbonaceous material | ||
[1983/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.1984 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.1984 [1984/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 600 North Dairy Ashford Houston, TX 77079 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/21] | For all designated states Conoco Inc. 1000 South Pine Street P.O. Box 1267 Ponca City Oklahoma 74603 / US | ||
Former [1980/22] | For all designated states CONOCO INC. 1000 South Pine Street P.O. Box 1267 Ponca City Oklahoma 74601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, John Henry 2505 Robin Road Ponca City, Oklahoma 74601 / US | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300430.8 | 14.02.1980 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | US19790030251 | 16.04.1979 Original published format: US 30251 | [1980/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018064 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018064 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C10L9/08 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
C10L9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1980/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kalzinieren von im "delayed-coking"-Prozess anfallenden Petrolkoks | [1983/29] | English: | Method and apparatus for calcining delayed petroleum coke | [1983/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de calcination de coke de pétrole obtenu par la méthode dite retardée | [1983/29] |
Former [1980/22] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Kalzinieren teilchenförmigen kohlenstoffhaltigen Materials | ||
Former [1980/22] | Method and apparatus for calcining particulate carbonaceous material | ||
Former [1980/22] | Procédé et dispositif de calcination de particules de matière carbonée | Examination procedure | 06.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/25] | 17.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE436918 [ ] (GEORG MARS DIPL ING); | US1671673 [ ] (DOERSCHUK VICTOR C, et al); | US3271268 [ ] (ALLRED VICTOR D); | US3619405 [ ] (SMITH JOHN H); | DE2932832 [ ] (LUMMUS CO, et al); | GB2028864 [ ] (LUMMUS CO, et al); | FR2433571 [ ] (LUMMUS CO [US]) |