EP0021556 - Novel deashed coal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.1985 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GULF RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY P.O. Box 2038 Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states GULF RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY P.O. Box 2038 Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15230 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulz, Johann Gustav D. 201 Conover Road Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15208 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Huskisson, Frank Mackie, et al FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Huskisson, Frank Mackie, et al FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300553.7 | 26.02.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | US19790046441 | 07.06.1979 Original published format: US 46441 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021556 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C10L9/06 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
C10G1/00 (EP,US);
C10L9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1981/01] | Title | German: | Entaschte Kohle | [1981/01] | English: | Novel deashed coal | [1981/01] | French: | Charbon dépoussiéré | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 23.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/36] | 22.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/37] | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/37] | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.1982 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.1982 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.1983 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4052448 [ ] (SCHULZ J GUSTAV, et al); | US2242822 [ ] (FUCHS WALTER M); | US4150040 [ ] (SCHULZ J GUSTAV) |