EP0017336 - Photopolymerisable elements, and relief printing plates made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/21] | Substrates suitable for the production of photopolymerisable elements, and relief printing plates made therefrom | ||
[1983/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.1984 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1984 [1984/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEXFORD LIMITED Imperial Chemical House Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/21] | For all designated states BEXFORD LIMITED Imperial Chemical House Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lambert, Stuart Geoffrey 64 Regent Road Brightlingsea Colchester Essex C07 ONW / GB | [1980/21] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Michael, et al Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents Po Box 6 Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/19] | Taylor, Michael, et al Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents Po Box 6 Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | ||
Former [1982/26] | Lloyd, Richard Paul Imperial Chemical Industries PLC Legal Department: Patents Po Box 6 Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | ||
Former [1980/21] | Arnold, Graham Donald ICI Group Intellectual Property P.O.Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300589.1 | 27.02.1980 | [1980/21] | Priority number, date | GB19790011062 | 29.03.1979 Original published format: GB 7911062 | GB19790019769 | 06.06.1979 Original published format: GB 7919769 | [1980/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0017336 | Date: | 15.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0017336 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/80 | [1980/21] | CPC: |
G03F7/11 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1980/21] | Title | German: | Photopolymerisierbare Elemente und daraus hergestellte Reliefdruckplatten | [1983/41] | English: | Photopolymerisable elements, and relief printing plates made therefrom | [1983/41] | French: | Eléments photopolymérisables et plaques d'impression en relief préparées à partir de ces supports | [1983/41] |
Former [1980/21] | Träger, die für die Herstellung photopolymerisierbarer Elemente geeignet sind, und daraus hergestellte Reliefdruckplatten | ||
Former [1980/21] | Substrates suitable for the production of photopolymerisable elements, and relief printing plates made therefrom | ||
Former [1980/21] | Supports utilisables pour la production d'éléments photopolymérisables et plaques d'impression en relief préparées à partir de ces supports | Examination procedure | 24.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/18] | 15.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 12.10.1983 | [1984/06] | Documents cited: | Search | US2634251 [ ] (PETER KASS); | DE2031476 [ ]; | GB1321108 [ ] (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | DE2411000 [ ] (ICI AMERICA INC) |