EP0016648 - A catalyst for cracking and/or oxidation of heavy hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1984 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.09.1984 [1984/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON MINING COMPANY LIMITED 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1980/20] | For all designated states NIPPON MINING COMPANY LIMITED 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujimori, Kuniaki No. 13-17 Ogikubo 3-chome Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Suzuka, Teruo No. 11-2-706 Kawaguchi 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Yukio No. 93, Shikatebukuro Urawa-shi Saitama / JP | 04 /
Aizawa, Shirou No. 5-2, Hon-cho 4-chome Toda-shi Saitama / JP | [1980/20] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Peter William, et al Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [1980/20] | Application number, filing date | 80300889.5 | 21.03.1980 | [1980/20] | Priority number, date | JP19790032269 | 22.03.1979 Original published format: JP 3226979 | [1980/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0016648 | Date: | 01.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0016648 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/02, C01B3/10, B01J23/74 | [1980/20] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP,US);
B01J23/755 (EP,US);
C01B3/063 (EP,US);
C01B3/10 (EP,US);
C10G11/02 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/20] | Title | German: | Katalysator zum Kracken und/oder Oxydieren schwerer Kohlenwasserstoffe | [1980/20] | English: | A catalyst for cracking and/or oxidation of heavy hydrocarbons | [1980/20] | French: | Catalyseur pour le craquage et/ou l'oxydation d'hydrocarbures lourds | [1980/20] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/16] | 22.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 03.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3726791 [ ] (KIMBERLIN C, et al); | US4115324 [ ] (OZAKI HIROMI, et al); | GB586914 [ ] (STANDARD OIL DEV CO) |