EP0018155 - Novel cephalosporin compounds, a process for the preparation thereof, pharmaceutical compositions containing the same and the use thereof as a therapeutic agent against a microorganism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.1982 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO INDUSTRI A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | For all designated states NOVO INDUSTRI A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borrevang, Poul 98, Taebyvej DK-2610 Rodovre / DK | 02 /
Petersen, Henning Borge 93A, Kulsviervej DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | 03 /
Komiyama, Tetsuro 450-31, Kuzume Washimiya-machi Kitakatsushika-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80301118.8 | 08.04.1980 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | DK19790001455 | 09.04.1979 Original published format: DK 145579 | [1980/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0018155 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0018155 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/65, A61K31/675 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
C07F9/65613 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1980/22] | Title | German: | Cephalosporinverbindungen, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen und ihre Verwendung als therapeutisches Mittel gegen einen Mikroorganismus | [1980/22] | English: | Novel cephalosporin compounds, a process for the preparation thereof, pharmaceutical compositions containing the same and the use thereof as a therapeutic agent against a microorganism | [1980/22] | French: | Composés de céphalosporine, procédé pour leur préparation, compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant et leur utilisation comme agents thérapeutiques contre un microorganisme | [1980/22] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 10.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/21] | 16.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1982/42] | 09.07.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1982 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1355872 (PFIZER); | [A]GB1382169 (SQUIBB & SONS INC); | [A]GB1430074 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | [A]FR2318875 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [A]GB1466710 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | [D] - CHEM. PHARM. BULL., Vol. 25, No. 111977 M. OCHIAI et al. "New Cephalosporin Derivatives with High Antibacterial Activities" pages 3115 to 3117. |