EP0018204 - Machine for automatically applying bag closures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.1981 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canadian Bakers Equipment Limited 1 Hafis Road Toronto, Ontario M6M 2V6 / CA | [1980/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flantua, Gysbertus R R 1 Waterdown, Ontario / CA | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 80301227.7 | 17.04.1980 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | CA19790326048 | 20.04.1979 Original published format: CA 326048 | [1980/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018204 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/04 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
B65B51/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, LU, NL, SE [1980/22] | Title | German: | Maschine zum automatischen Anbringen von Beutelverschlüssen | [1980/22] | English: | Machine for automatically applying bag closures | [1980/22] | French: | Machine pour appliquer automatiquement des fermetures de sacs | [1980/22] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/06] | 19.11.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3163969 [ ]; | US3163972 [ ]; | US3621632 [ ] |