EP0020071 - Missing pulse detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1984 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1984 [1984/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states LUCAS INDUSTRIES public limited company Great King Street Birmingham, B19 2XF West Midlands / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walker, Michael John 21 Rathbone Road Bearwood, Warley West Midlands, B67 5JG / GB | [1980/25] | Representative(s) | Prutton, Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | Prutton, Roger, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 80301634.4 | 19.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | GB19790018385 | 25.05.1979 Original published format: GB 7918385 | [1980/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0020071 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020071 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/19 | [1980/25] | CPC: |
G01R29/0273 (EP,US);
H03K5/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/25] | Title | German: | Detektor zum Erkennen fehlender Impulse | [1980/25] | English: | Missing pulse detector | [1980/25] | French: | Détecteur d'impulsions manquantes | [1980/25] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/17] | 30.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 12.10.1983 | NL | 12.10.1983 | [1984/28] |
Former [1984/21] | BE | 12.10.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | US4142159 [ ] (INGRAM CHARLES B, et al); | US3617905 [ ] (CASTELLI JOSEPH N) | Examination | DE2644646 |