EP0021745 - An automatic temperature control system for a vehicle passenger compartment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION 100 Erieview Plaza Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION 100 Erieview Plaza Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franz, Rudolf Joseph 308 E.Weathersfield Way Schaumburg Illinois 60172 / US | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 80301994.2 | 13.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | US19790050022 | 18.06.1979 Original published format: US 50022 | [1981/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0021745 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B60H3/04, G05D23/19 | [1981/01] | CPC: |
B60H1/00807 (EP,US);
B60H1/00821 (EP,US);
B60H1/3205 (EP,US);
G05D23/1925 (EP,US);
B60H2001/3266 (EP,US);
B60H2001/327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/01] | Title | German: | System zur automatischen Temperatursteuerung eines Fahrgastraumes eines Fahrzeuges | [1981/01] | English: | An automatic temperature control system for a vehicle passenger compartment | [1981/01] | French: | Système de commande automatique de la température d'un compartiment pour passagers d'un véhicule | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/27] | 14.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/22] | 24.02.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3667245 [ ] (TILL JAMES PETER, et al); | US3183962 [ ] (STEINHAGEN WILLIAM K, et al); | US4102150 [ ] (KOUNTZ KENNETH JOHN); | US3678700 [ ] (BOZICH ROBERT A); | US3411703 [ ] (ZENGEL WAYNE W); | US3738120 [ ] (BEATENBOUGH P); | US3703086 [ ] (NIJO KIYOICHI) |