EP0026965 - Hydraulic manifold assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.1985 [1985/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Tractor Co. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/15] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria, Illinois 61629 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carr, Charles W. 2585, Nine and One Half Street East Moline Illinois 61244 / US | 02 /
Forster, Kevin G. R.R. No. 1 51 Box 737 Terre Haute Indiana 47805 / US | [1981/15] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/15] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302325.8 | 09.07.1980 | [1981/15] | Priority number, date | WO1979US00819 | 04.10.1979 Original published format: PCT/US79/00819 | [1981/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0026965 | Date: | 15.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0026965 | Date: | 02.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026965 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/00, F16L39/00, F04D29/40, F04B39/12, B60T17/04 | [1981/15] | CPC: |
F16L39/00 (EP);
B60T17/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [1981/15] | Title | German: | Hydraulische Rohrverzweigungseinheit | [1981/15] | English: | Hydraulic manifold assembly | [1981/15] | French: | Assemblage d'un embranchement hydraulique | [1981/15] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1980 | Examination requested [1981/15] | 26.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR787829 [ ]; | US2119420 [ ]; | US3812910 [ ]; | FR917631 [ ]; | US3856334 [ ]; | DE1018275 [ ]; | US2928294 [ ] (GARRETT WILLIAM R) |