EP0025265 - Improvements in or relating to antenna arrangements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.10.1983 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE MARCONI COMPANY LIMITED Marconi House New Street Chelmsford Essex CM1 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | For all designated states THE MARCONI COMPANY LIMITED Marconi House New Street Chelmsford Essex CM1 1PL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, David 11 Lewis Drive Chelmsford Essex CM2 9EE / GB | [1981/11] | Representative(s) | Hoste, Colin Francis Marconi Intellectual Property Crompton Close Basildon Essex SS14 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | Hoste, Colin Francis The Marconi Company Limited Marconi House New Street Chelmsford, Essex CM1 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302453.8 | 21.07.1980 | [1981/11] | Priority number, date | GB19790028011 | 10.08.1979 Original published format: GB 7928011 | [1981/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025265 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/34 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
H01Q3/42 (EP,US);
H01Q3/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/11] | Title | German: | Antennenanlagen | [1981/11] | English: | Improvements in or relating to antenna arrangements | [1981/11] | French: | Dispositifs d'antenne | [1981/11] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/15] | 29.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.06.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1983/50] | 24.08.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1983/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1983 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP55010271 ; | [AP]DE2812575 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US3832713 (RUBIN D) | [AP] - Patents Abstracts of Japan, Vol. 4, Nr. 36, 26 March, 1980, page 156E3, & JP-A-55 010 271, & JP55010271 A 00000000 |