EP0024154 - Paper feed and image transfer for electrostatographic copiers and duplicators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.1984 [1984/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RONEO ALCATEL LIMITED P.O. Box 3 South Street Romford Essex RM1 2AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/08] | For all designated states RONEO ALCATEL LIMITED P.O. Box 3 South Street Romford Essex RM1 2AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erskine, William Graham Springhill House Morpeth Northumberland / GB | 02 /
Moore, Kenneth 4 Caledonian Great Lumley Chester Le Street, County Durham / GB | 03 /
Purvis, Ronald Dalmeny House Dipwood Road Rowlands Gill Tyne and Wear / GB | 04 /
Ridley, Robert, F. 20 Thropton Crescent Gosforth Newcastle Upon Tyne / GB | 05 /
Shreeve, Nicholas Gilbert 3 Brackley Weybridge Surrey / GB | [1981/08] | Representative(s) | Cole, Paul Gilbert, et al Hughes Clark Andrews & Byrne 63 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/51] | Cole, Paul Gilbert, et al Hughes Clark Andrews & Byrne 63 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3JU / GB | ||
Former [1981/08] | Cole, Paul Gilbert Hughes Clark Andrews & Byrne Management House Parker Street London WC1B 2PU / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302656.6 | 04.08.1980 | [1981/08] | Priority number, date | GB19790029020 | 21.08.1979 Original published format: GB 7929020 | [1981/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024154 | Date: | 25.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024154 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [1981/08] | CPC: |
G03G15/6532 (EP,US);
G03G15/1675 (EP,US);
G03G2215/1609 (EP,US);
G03G2215/1614 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/08] | Title | German: | Papierzuführung und Bildübertragung für elektrostatographische Kopier- und Vervielfältigungsapparate | [1981/08] | English: | Paper feed and image transfer for electrostatographic copiers and duplicators | [1981/08] | French: | Transport de papier et transfert d'image pour machines à copier et à polycopier électrostatographiques | [1981/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/43] | 04.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 24.08.1983 | LI | 24.08.1983 | [1984/02] | Documents cited: | Search | US4183653 [ ] (KUDOH KUNIO [JP], et al); | US4171157 [ ] (SUZUKI YOSHIRO [JP]); | CH545496 [ ] (TURLABOR AG [CH]); | US4027960 [ ] (LADRIGAN J WILLIAM); | DE2813741 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | DE2832181 [ ] (RICOH KK); | US3970381 [ ] (MEAGHER THOMAS, et al); | US3998536 [ ] (KAUPP NORBETT H) |