EP0026037 - Machine and method for producing a stitch bonded fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1983 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1981/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Porter, Kenneth, DR. 44 Walton Park Harrogate North Yorkshire HG3 1EJ / GB | [1981/13] | Representative(s) | Hulse, Raymond, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City, Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/13] | Hulse, Raymond, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 80302674.9 | 05.08.1980 | [1981/13] | Priority number, date | GB19790033141 | 25.09.1979 Original published format: GB 7933141 | [1981/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026037 | Date: | 01.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/52 | [1981/13] | CPC: |
D04H1/52 (EP,US);
D04H3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/13] | Title | German: | Maschine und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Nähwirkstoffes | [1981/13] | English: | Machine and method for producing a stitch bonded fabric | [1981/13] | French: | Machine et procédé pour la fabrication d'un tissu lié par couture-tricotage | [1981/13] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1980 | Examination requested [1981/13] | 17.02.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1983/39] | 21.06.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1982 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2407288 [ ] (ICI LTD [GB]) |