EP0025322 - Vehicle for transporting containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states David MacKrill Engineering Ltd. Unit Six, Robert Boby Works St. Andrews Street South Bury St. Edmunds Suffolk IP33 3PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | For all designated states David MacKrill Engineering Ltd. Unit Six, Robert Boby Works St. Andrews Street South Bury St. Edmunds Suffolk IP33 3PH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Michael John 3 Diomed Drive Great Barton Bury St. Edmunds Suffolk / GB | 02 /
Holland, Simon Jeffree Roy 3 Twites Farm Cottages Great Saxham Bury St. Edmunds Suffolk / GB | [1981/11] | Representative(s) | Cowan, David Robert, et al WALFORD AND HARDMAN BROWN 5 The Quadrant Coventry CV1 2EL / GB | [1981/11] | Application number, filing date | 80303006.3 | 29.08.1980 | [1981/11] | Priority number, date | GB19790030886 | 06.09.1979 Original published format: GB 7930886 | [1981/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025322 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0025322 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/64 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
B60P1/6463 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/11] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug zum Transportieren von Containern | [1981/11] | English: | Vehicle for transporting containers | [1981/11] | French: | Véhicule pour le transport de conteneurs | [1981/11] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/46] | 05.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1982 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.1984 | BE | 13.06.1984 | CH | 13.06.1984 | IT | 13.06.1984 | LI | 13.06.1984 | NL | 13.06.1984 | SE | 13.06.1984 | LU | 31.08.1984 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.06.1984 | |
BE | 13.06.1984 | ||
CH | 13.06.1984 | ||
IT | 13.06.1984 | ||
LI | 13.06.1984 | ||
NL | 13.06.1984 | ||
SE | 13.06.1984 | ||
Former [1986/12] | AT | 13.06.1984 | |
BE | 13.06.1984 | ||
CH | 13.06.1984 | ||
LI | 13.06.1984 | ||
NL | 13.06.1984 | ||
SE | 13.06.1984 | ||
Former [1985/25] | AT | 13.06.1984 | |
BE | 13.06.1984 | ||
CH | 13.06.1984 | ||
LI | 13.06.1984 | ||
NL | 13.06.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | BE | 13.06.1984 | |
CH | 13.06.1984 | ||
LI | 13.06.1984 | ||
NL | 13.06.1984 | ||
Former [1985/16] | BE | 13.06.1984 | |
CH | 13.06.1984 | ||
LI | 13.06.1984 | ||
Former [1984/44] | CH | 13.06.1984 | |
LI | 13.06.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2169810 [ ] (SHEPPARD EQUIPMENT LTD [GB]); | FR2301408 [ ] (LEMAIRE PIERRE [FR]); | DE2616813 [ ] (MULTILIFT OY); | FR2332153 [ ] (GUIMA [FR]); | FR2391092 [ ] (LEMAIRE PIERRE [FR]); | FR2411729 [ ] (GRUELLES MAURICE [FR]); | [P]GB2033346 (PARTEK AB); | [E]EP0012145 (GRUELLES MAURICE) |