EP0026679 - Improvements relating to blood sampling apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1985 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stafford, Rodney Arthur Cloon House Glencree Co. Wicklow / IE | For all designated states Kilroy, Michael Maxwell Castlecor Oldcastle Meath / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | For all designated states Stafford, Rodney Arthur Cloon House Glencree Co. Wicklow / IE | ||
For all designated states Kilroy, Michael Maxwell Castlecor Oldcastle Meath / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennett, Michael Benedict 147 Blackberry Rise Portmarnock County Dublin / IE | 02 /
Stafford, Rodney Arthur Cloon House Glencree Co. Wicklow / IE | 03 /
Kilroy, Michael Maxwell Castlecor Oldcastle County Meath / IE | [1984/35] |
Former [1984/28] | 01 /
Bennett, Michael Benedict 147 Blackberry Rise Portmarnock County Dublin / IE | ||
02 /
Stafford, Rodney Arthur Cloon House Glencree Dublin 6 / IE | |||
03 /
Kilroy, Michael Maxwell Castlecor Oldcastle County Meath / IE | |||
Former [1981/14] | 01 /
Bennett, Michael Benedict 147 Blackberry Rise Portmarnock County Dublin / IE | ||
02 /
Stafford, Rodney Arthur 57 Bushy Park Road Dublin 6 / IE | |||
03 /
Kilroy, Michael Maxwell Castlecor Oldcastle County Meath / IE | Representative(s) | Jennings, Roy Alfred GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [1981/14] | Application number, filing date | 80303482.6 | 02.10.1980 | [1981/14] | Priority number, date | IE19790001877 | 02.10.1979 Original published format: IE 187779 | IE19790002187 | 14.11.1979 Original published format: IE 218779 | IE19790002510 | 21.12.1979 Original published format: IE 251079 | IE19800000373 | 25.02.1980 Original published format: IE 37380 | IE19800000855 | 25.04.1980 Original published format: IE 85580 | IE19800001758 | 20.08.1980 Original published format: IE 175880 | IE19800001837 | 29.08.1980 Original published format: IE 183780 | [1981/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026679 | Date: | 08.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026679 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/14 | [1981/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/15003 (EP);
A61B5/150351 (EP);
A61B5/150389 (EP);
A61B5/150488 (EP);
A61B5/150587 (EP);
A61B5/150717 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/14] | Title | German: | Blutentnahme-Apparat | [1981/14] | English: | Improvements relating to blood sampling apparatus | [1981/14] | French: | Appareil de prise de sang | [1981/14] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/47] | 31.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.08.1984 | NL | 29.08.1984 | SE | 29.08.1984 | LU | 31.10.1984 | [1999/52] |
Former [1986/12] | AT | 29.08.1984 | |
NL | 29.08.1984 | ||
SE | 29.08.1984 | ||
Former [1985/25] | AT | 29.08.1984 | |
NL | 29.08.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | NL | 29.08.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | FR1337891 [ ]; | FR1416487 [ ]; | GB1059257 [ ]; | FR1511044 [ ] |