EP0051697 - Hydrocyanation of activated olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.1984 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY Midland Building Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [1982/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pesa, Frederick Anthony 764 Circlewood Drive Aurora Ohio 44202 / US | 02 /
Graham, Anne Marie 6290 Greenwood Parkway 103 Northfield Ohio 44067 / US | [1982/20] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/20] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 80303540.1 | 08.10.1980 | [1982/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051697 | Date: | 19.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0051697 | Date: | 08.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C120/02, C07C121/407, C07C121/34, C07C121/20, B01J23/02, B01J23/04 | [1982/20] | CPC: |
C07C253/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/10, C07C255/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/20] | Title | German: | Hydrocyanierung aktivierter Olefine | [1982/20] | English: | Hydrocyanation of activated olefins | [1982/20] | French: | Hydrocyanation d'oléfines activées | [1982/20] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/01] | 30.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1984 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US3278575 [ ] | [ ] - Houben-Weyl "Methoden der Organischen Chemie, Sauerstoffverbindungen III" 1952, Geord Thieme Verlag, Stuttgart page 271 | Examination | US2904581 | US3480660 |