EP0028487 - Hall effect thickness measuring instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1982 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPA TECHNOLOGY, INC. 60 Oak Drive Syosset New York 11791 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | For all designated states UPA TECHNOLOGY, INC. 60 Oak Drive Syosset New York 11791 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lieber, Derek 337 Fairhaven Boulevard Woodbury New York 11797 / US | 02 /
Golick, Sidney 74-64 220th Street Bayside New York 11364 / US | [1981/19] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Alan, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | [1981/19] | Application number, filing date | 80303766.2 | 23.10.1980 | [1981/19] | Priority number, date | US19790090654 | 02.11.1979 Original published format: US 90654 | [1981/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028487 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/10 | [1981/19] | CPC: |
G01B7/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/19] | Title | German: | Dickenmessgerät mit Hall-Effekt | [1981/19] | English: | Hall effect thickness measuring instrument | [1981/19] | French: | Instrument de mesure d'épaisseur à effet Hall | [1981/19] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 04.02.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/28] | 15.04.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4005360 [ ]; | US2862178 [ ] (CULLEN MOORE WILLIAM); | DE2114143 [ ]; | US3213542 [ ] | [ ] - TECHNIK, Vol. 30, No. 11, November 1975 Berlin (DE) J. PELIKANOVA: "Praktische Aspekte der magnetostatischen Dickenmessung mit Anwendung eines Hallgenerators" pages 700 to 703 * page 701, left-hand column, line 16 to page 702, left-hand column, line 8; page 703, left-hand columnlines 17 to 21 * |