EP0028924 - Charged particle beam tube and method of operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1985 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1986 [1986/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONTROL DATA CORPORATION 8100-34th Avenue South Minneapolis Minnesota 55440 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | For all designated states CONTROL DATA CORPORATION 8100-34th Avenue South Minneapolis Minnesota 55440 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harte, Kenneth Jeremy 64 Estabrook Road Carlisle, Massachusetts 01741 / US | 02 /
Dougherty, Edward Cecil 104 View Street Dracut, Massachusetts 01826 / US | [1981/20] | Representative(s) | Caro, William Egerton, et al J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [1981/20] | Application number, filing date | 80303974.2 | 06.11.1980 | [1981/20] | Priority number, date | US19790093008 | 09.11.1979 Original published format: US 93008 | [1981/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028924 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028924 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/46, H01J31/60, H01J3/12 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
H01J29/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/20] | H01J29/46, H01J31/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/20] | Title | German: | Geladene Teilchenstrahlröhre und Verfahren zu deren Betrieb | [1981/20] | English: | Charged particle beam tube and method of operating the same | [1981/20] | French: | Tube à faisceau de particules chargées et procédé pour son utilisation | [1981/20] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/40] | 19.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3873878 [ ] (ODENTHAL CONRAD J); | US3952227 [ ] (VAN ALPHEN WILLEM MEIJNDERT); | GB2000903 [ ] (CONTROL DATA CORP); | US4196373 [ ] (PARKS HAROLD G [US]) | [ ] - IEEE ELECTRO 76 PROFESSIONAL PROGRAM, No. 1976, 1976 New York (US) D.E. SPELIOTIS et al.: "Electron Beam Memories", pages 1-13 * page 3, left-hand column, lines 2-14; pages 8, 9, paragraph entitled: "Description of the Array Optics Tube"; figure 9 * |