EP0029365 - Wrap-around type package for bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1986 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Mead Corporation Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton Ohio 45463 / US | ||
Former [1981/21] | For all designated states THE MEAD CORPORATION 2000 Courthouse Plaza NE. Dayton Ohio 45401-1817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bakx, Martinus Cornelius Maria Helmersflat 37 Roosendaal / NL | [1981/21] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/21] | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 80304108.6 | 14.11.1980 | [1981/21] | Priority number, date | GB19790039621 | 15.11.1979 Original published format: GB 7939621 | [1981/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0029365 | Date: | 27.05.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0029365 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/00 | [1981/21] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00185 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00277 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0029 (EP,US);
B65D2571/00444 (EP,US);
B65D2571/0045 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/21] | Title | German: | Wickelartige Verpackung für Flaschen | [1981/21] | English: | Wrap-around type package for bottles | [1981/21] | French: | Emballage de bouteilles en forme de gaine | [1981/21] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1981 | Examination requested [1982/05] | 15.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1983 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.1984 | 30.11.1984 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | FR2135347 [ ] (UNILEVER NV); | US3904036 [ ] (FORRER HOMER W); | US4007830 [ ] (CALVERT RODNEY K); | US4093116 [ ] (WATKINS RICHARD KENNETH, et al); | US4101069 [ ] (WOOD PRENTICE J); | US4131230 [ ] (KOEHLINGER ALLEN W, et al) |