EP0031994 - Organopolysiloxanes that contain sulfur and curable compositions including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1985 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1985 [1985/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Auburn, MI 48611 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/28] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION Midland Michigan 48640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Homan, Gary Rex 2801 Dawn Drive Midland Michigan / US | 02 /
Lee, Chi-Long 1813 Brookfield Drive Midland Michigan / US | [1981/28] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/28] | Lewin, John Harvey Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 80304154.0 | 20.11.1980 | [1981/28] | Priority number, date | US19790099300 | 03.12.1979 Original published format: US 99300 | [1981/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0031994 | Date: | 15.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0031994 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0031994 | Date: | 11.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/48, C08L83/14, C08K5/00, C08J3/24 | [1981/28] | CPC: |
C08G77/50 (EP,US);
C08L83/08 (KR);
C08G77/392 (EP,US);
C08L83/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/28] | Title | German: | Schwefel enthaltende Organopolysiloxane und diese enthaltende härtbare Zusammensetzungen | [1981/28] | English: | Organopolysiloxanes that contain sulfur and curable compositions including the same | [1981/28] | French: | Organopolysiloxanes contenant du soufre et compositions durcissables les contenant | [1981/28] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/22] | 25.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4039505 (HOMAN GARY R, et al); | [A]US3122522 (BROWN PAUL L, et al); | [A]DE1198063 (DOW CORNING); | [A]US3317461 (PLUEDDEMANN EDWIN P); | [D]US3294739 (WEYENBERG DONALD R) |