EP0030802 - Sorting particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.1985 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCCIDENTAL RESEARCH CORPORATION 2100 S.E. Main Street Irvine, California 92714 / US | [1981/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DiGiacomo, Peter Michael 27671 Estepona Mission Viejo California 92691 / US | 02 /
White, William R. 27502 Del Gado, 3 Capistrano Beach California 92624 / US | 03 /
McKinley, John Richard 4 Calhoun Irvine California 92714 / US | 04 /
Park, Won Choon 4052 Old Mill Street Irvine California 92714 / US | [1981/25] | Representative(s) | Jack, Bruce J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | Jack, Bruce James, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80304174.8 | 20.11.1980 | [1981/25] | Priority number, date | US19790100618 | 05.12.1979 Original published format: US 100618 | US19790108611 | 31.12.1979 Original published format: US 108611 | [1981/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0030802 | Date: | 24.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0030802 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B03B1/04, B07C5/342, B07C5/344, B07C5/346, B03B13/02 | [1981/25] | CPC: |
B03B1/04 (EP);
B03B13/02 (EP);
B07C5/3427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/25] | Title | German: | Sortieren von Partikeln | [1981/25] | English: | Sorting particles | [1981/25] | French: | Triage de particules | [1981/25] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/09] | 31.05.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/50] | 28.06.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1985/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3356211 ; | [AD]WO7900950 ; | [A]WO7900952 ; | [AD]US3346111 ; | [AD]US3901793 ; | [AD]US4169045 |