EP0030434 - Methanol homologation using cobalt-ruthenium catalysts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1984 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.1985 [1985/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/24] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doyle, Gerald Box 20 R.D. 1 Whitehouse Station New Jersey / US | [1981/24] | Representative(s) | Field, Roger Norton, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/34] | Field, Roger Norton (GB), et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1981/24] | Field, Roger Norton ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Apex Tower High Street New Malden Surrey KT3 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 80304289.4 | 28.11.1980 | [1981/24] | Priority number, date | US19790098981 | 30.11.1979 Original published format: US 98981 | [1981/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030434 | Date: | 17.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030434 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/32, C07C45/49, C07C27/00, C07C31/08, C07C47/06, B01J31/18, B01J31/20, B01J31/28, B01J27/08 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
C07C29/32 (EP,US);
B01J23/20 (EP,US);
B01J23/24 (EP,US);
C07C45/49 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/32, C07C31/08 (US,EP);
C07C29/32, C07C31/10 (US,EP);
C07C45/49, C07C47/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/24] | C07C27/00, C07C29/32, C07C45/49, C07C31/08, C07C47/06, B01J31/18, B01J31/20, B01J31/28, B01J27/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/24] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Homologen des Methanols unter Verwendung von Kobalt-Ruthenium-Katalysatoren | [1981/24] | English: | Methanol homologation using cobalt-ruthenium catalysts | [1981/24] | French: | Homologation de méthanol en utilisant des catalyseurs contenant du ruthénium et du cobalt | [1981/24] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 20.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 08.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2007652 [ ] (CHEM SYSTEMS) | Examination | EP0013464 | EP0022038 | EP0022735 | US4133966 | EP0029086 | EP0029723 |