EP0030820 - Safety pressure relief device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1983 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROFABRICATION & ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED Gloucester Road West Chirton Industrial Estate North Shields Tyne & Wear, NE29 8RQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | For all designated states ELECTROFABRICATION & ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED Gloucester Road West Chirton Industrial Estate North Shields Tyne & Wear, NE29 8RQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bush, Michael Edward 7 Melbourne Crescent Whitley Bay Tyne & Wear / GB | [1981/25] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Michael John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 80304362.9 | 03.12.1980 | [1981/25] | Priority number, date | GB19790042938 | 13.12.1979 Original published format: GB 7942938 | [1981/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030820 | Date: | 24.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/16 | [1981/25] | CPC: |
F16K17/162 (EP);
F16K17/1633 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/25] | Title | German: | Überdruck-Sicherheitsvorrichtung | [1981/25] | English: | Safety pressure relief device | [1981/25] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité de surpression | [1981/25] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 08.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/36] | 16.05.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1982 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE864497 [ ]; | GB1516216 [ ]; | US2553267 [ ]; | DE2143939 [ ]; | US2576431 [ ]; | DE1806797 [ ]; | CH166300 [ ]; | GB1138885 [ ] |